VA HB1889 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1889
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord remedies; noncompliance with rental agreement; payment plan; extend sunset. Extends the sunset date from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022, of certain provisions enacted during the 2020 Special Session related to the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act. Such provisions (i) changed from five to 14 days the amount of time that a landlord who owns four or fewer rental dwelling units must wait after serving written notice on a tenant notifying the tenant of his nonpayment of rent and of the landlord's intention to terminate the rental agreement if rent is not paid before the landlord may pursue remedies for termination of the rental agreement; (ii) required a landlord who owns more than four rental dwelling units, or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units, before terminating a rental agreement due to nonpayment of rent, to serve upon such tenant a written notice informing the tenant of the total amount due and owed and offer the tenant a payment plan under which the tenant must pay the total amount due and owed in equal monthly installments over a period of the lesser of six months or the time remaining under the rental agreement; (iii) outlined the remedies a landlord has if a tenant fails to pay the total amount due and owed or enter into a payment arrangement within 14 days of receiving notice or if the tenant enters into a payment arrangement but fails to pay within 14 days of the due date any rent that becomes due under the payment plan or arrangement after such plan or arrangement becomes effective; and (iv) clarified that a tenant is not precluded from participating in any other rent relief programs available to the tenant through a nonprofit organization or under the provisions of a federal, state, or local law, regulation, or action. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord remedies; noncompliance with rental agreement; payment plan; extend sunset. Extends the sunset date from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022, of certain provisions enacted during the 2020 Special Session related to the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act. Such provisions (i) changed from five to 14 days the amount of time that a landlord who owns four or fewer rental dwelling units must wait after serving written notice on a tenant notifying the tenant of his nonpayment of rent and of the landlord's intention to terminate the rental agreement if rent is not paid before the landlord may pursue remedies for termination of the rental agreement; (ii) required a landlord who owns more than four rental dwelling units, or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units, before terminating a rental agreement due to nonpayment of rent, to serve upon such tenant a written notice informing the tenant of the total amount due and owed and offer the tenant a payment plan under which the tenant must pay the total amount due and owed in equal monthly installments over a period of the lesser of six months or the time remaining under the rental agreement; (iii) outlined the remedies a landlord has if a tenant fails to pay the total amount due and owed or enter into a payment arrangement within 14 days of receiving notice or if the tenant enters into a payment arrangement but fails to pay within 14 days of the due date any rent that becomes due under the payment plan or arrangement after such plan or arrangement becomes effective; and (iv) clarified that a tenant is not precluded from participating in any other rent relief programs available to the tenant through a nonprofit organization or under the provisions of a federal, state, or local law, regulation, or action.
Title
Va. Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord remedies, noncompliance with rental agreement.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 43-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 492 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1889ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200362D-S1 (52-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1889S1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200362D-S1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200362D-S1 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101527D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1889 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Landlord and Tenant
Rental Property
Uncodified Legislation
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act
Rental Property
Uncodified Legislation
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act