VA HB1888 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Limitations period; sexual abuse. Eliminates the civil statute of limitations period for injury resulting from sexual abuse occurring during the infancy or incapacity of the abused person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual abuse; limitations period.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100897D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801243(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback