VA HB1888 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-21 - House: Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-21 - House: Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Liens for water and sewer charges imposed by localities. Alters the method by which localities can collect delinquent water bills from users of residential rental properties. The changes will put such localities on the same footing as water and sewer authorities, including requirements that the locality (i) provide written notice to the owner of its lien policy when service is initiated, (ii) provide the owner duplicate copies of delinquent bills, and (iii) pursue regular collection efforts against the renter.
Title
Water and sewer charges; liens imposed by localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-21 | House: Tabled in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103001D |