VA HB1887 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-4)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Posting human trafficking hotline information. Requires the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority and the Virginia Employment Commission to post notice of the existence of a human trafficking hotline in government stores, except for government stores established on a distiller's licensed premises, and in employment offices, respectively, to alert possible witnesses or victims of human trafficking to the availability of a means to report crimes or gain assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking hotline; posting information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1887ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HousePrinted as engrossed 19100371D-E
2019-01-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1887E
2019-01-22HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-22HouseRead second time
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100371D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41119.1(n/a)See Bill Text
602400.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1887
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1887+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1887E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1887ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0388+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0008+HB1887
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0041+HB1887
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1784+HB1887
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0148+HB1887
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1887+HB1887
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1887+HB1887

Bill Comments

feedback