VA HB1885 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Organized retail theft; report; penalty. Establishes the crime of organized retail theft that makes it a Class 3 felony for any person who conspires or acts in concert with another person to commit simple larceny of retail property from one or more retail mercantile establishments, with a value exceeding $5,000 aggregated over a 90-day period, with the intent to sell such retail property for monetary or other gain, and who takes or causes such retail property to be placed in the control of a retail property fence or other person and either (i) receives or possesses any retail property that has been obtained by simple larceny from one or more retail mercantile establishments while knowing or having reasonable grounds to believe the property was unlawfully obtained or (ii) conspires or acts in concert with two or more other persons as an organizer, supervisor, financier, leader, or manager to engage for profit in a scheme or course of conduct to effectuate the transfer or sale of property obtained by simple larceny from one or more retail mercantile establishments. The bill defines the terms retail mercantile establishment, retail property, and retail property fence. The bill also establishes the Organized Retail Crime Fund to be administered by the Attorney General solely for the purposes of awarding grants to attorneys for the Commonwealth and law-enforcement agencies to investigate, indict, and prosecute violations of organized retail theft and associated fraud and property crimes.
Title
Organized retail theft; establishes as a crime, report, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption #2 (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1885ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption #2 (52-Y 45-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House (52-Y 45-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23106924D-S1 (51-Y 46-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1885S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106924D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106924D-S1 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101037D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1396 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
SB1396 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
SB1396 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Appropriations
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Appropriations
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 103.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 104.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 137 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 511.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |