VA HB1884 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1884
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Facilitated enrollment program. Directs the Department of Taxation to include space on the appropriate individual income tax forms for voluntary inclusion of personal and contact information. Such information may be shared with the Department of Medical Assistance Services, the Department of Social Services, or the Virginia Health Benefit Exchange, as applicable, for use in determining eligibility for certain programs. Beginning with tax year 2022, the Department of Taxation shall also include a checkoff box for taxpayers to indicate their consent to the sharing of tax information with the Department of Medical Assistance Services and the Department of Social Services. Beginning with tax year 2023, there shall also be included a checkoff box for taxpayers to indicate their consent to the sharing of tax information with the Virginia Health Benefit Exchange. The bill contains provisions allowing disclosure of such information in accordance with the act. The bill also directs the Virginia Health Benefits Exchange to, in consultation with other government agencies and stakeholders, identify systems, policies, and practices to facilitate eligibility determinations and enrollment. Facilitated enrollment program. Directs the Department of Taxation to include space on the appropriate individual income tax forms for voluntary inclusion of personal and contact information. Such information may be shared with the Department of Medical Assistance Services, the Department of Social Services, or the Virginia Health Benefit Exchange, as applicable, for use in determining eligibility for certain programs. Beginning with tax year 2022, the Department of Taxation shall also include a checkoff box for taxpayers to indicate their consent to the sharing of tax information with the Department of Medical Assistance Services and the Department of Social Services. Beginning with tax year 2023, there shall also be included a checkoff box for taxpayers to indicate their consent to the sharing of tax information with the Virginia Health Benefit Exchange. The bill contains provisions allowing disclosure of such information in accordance with the act. The bill also directs the Virginia Health Benefits Exchange to, in consultation with other government agencies and stakeholders, identify systems, policies, and practices to facilitate eligibility determinations and enrollment.
Title
Income tax, state; voluntary inclusion of personal & contact information on appropriate forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Referred from Labor and Commerce (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Referred from Labor and Commerce (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (76-Y 24-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (76-Y 24-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101894D-E |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1884E |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101894D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1884 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 6505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 341.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |