VA HB1884 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption; certain surviving spouses. Authorizes localities to exempt the primary residence of the surviving spouse of a law-enforcement officer, firefighter, search and rescue personnel, and emergency medical services personnel who is killed in the line of duty. The exemption does not apply to that portion of the value of the residence in excess of the average assessed value of dwellings in the locality. The bill is pursuant to Article X, Section 6-B of the Constitution of Virginia, which was adopted by the voters in 2016.
Title
Real property tax; exemption for certain surviving spouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION 2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION 2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248) | |
2017-02-24 | House | Enacted, Chapter 248 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1884ER2) |
2017-02-24 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION 2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1884ER) |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101197D-E |
2017-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1884E |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101197D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3219.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |