VA HB1883 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupational health and safety laws; amount of civil penalties. Increases the maximum amount of civil penalties that may be assessed by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry for certain violations of occupational safety and health laws from $7,000 to $12,471 and for willful or repeated violations of such laws from $70,000 to $124,709. The measure also requires the Commissioner annually to increase the maximum civil penalty amounts, starting in 2018, by an amount that reflects the percentage increase, if any, in the consumer price index from the previous calendar year. This bill is identical to SB 1542.
Title
Occupational safety and health laws; increases maximum amount of civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1883ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102979D |