VA HB1882 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1882
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Deeds of trust; amendment to loan document; statement of interest rate of a refinance mortgage. Provides that a deed of trust that has been recorded and that states that it secures indebtedness or other obligations under a loan document and that it also secures indebtedness or other obligations under such loan document as it may be amended, modified, supplemented, or restated shall secure such loan document as amended, modified, supplemented, or restated from time to time, without the necessity of recording an amendment to such deed of trust. The bill further requires that the interest rate of a prior mortgage be stated on the first page of a refinance mortgage. Deeds of trust; amendment to loan document; statement of interest rate of a refinance mortgage. Provides that a deed of trust that has been recorded and that states that it secures indebtedness or other obligations under a loan document and that it also secures indebtedness or other obligations under such loan document as it may be amended, modified, supplemented, or restated shall secure such loan document as amended, modified, supplemented, or restated from time to time, without the necessity of recording an amendment to such deed of trust. The bill further requires that the interest rate of a prior mortgage be stated on the first page of a refinance mortgage.
Title
Deeds of trust; amendment to loan document, statement of interest rate of a refinanced mortgage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 13 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021 | |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1882ER) |
2021-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101257D-E |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1882E |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101257D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1882 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)