VA HB1881 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Enterprise zone job creation grants. Provides that, for purposes of wage requirements for the enterprise zone job creation grant program, the minimum wage shall be the higher of the state minimum wage or the federal minimum wage. The bill also reduces the percentage of the minimum wage that grant eligible jobs must meet. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enterprise zone job creation grants; wage requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N)
2021-01-18HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102085D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591547(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback