VA HB1879 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1879

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption. Allows distillers that have been appointed as agents of the Board of Directors (the Board) of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority), mixed beverage restaurant licensees, and limited mixed beverage restaurant licensees to sell mixed beverages for off-premises consumption and deliver such mixed beverages to consumers subject to requirements set forth in the bill. The bill allows the Board to summarily revoke a licensee's privileges to sell and deliver mixed beverages for off-premises consumption for noncompliance with the requirements set forth in the bill or applicable provisions of current law. The bill also allows farm winery licensees to sell pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption. The bill directs the Authority to convene a work group to study the sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption and report its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by November 1, 2021. The provisions of this bill sunset on July 1, 2022, and

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 281 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1879ER)
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled
2021-02-16SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateRead third time
2021-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
2021-02-02HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseReported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102643D

Same As/Similar To

HB1879 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
SB1299 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
SB1299 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41119(n/a)See Bill Text
41204(n/a)See Bill Text
41206.1(n/a)See Bill Text
41206.3(n/a)See Bill Text
41207(n/a)See Bill Text
41210(n/a)See Bill Text
41212.1(n/a)See Bill Text
41221(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1879
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1879+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1879ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0281+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1879F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1879FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1103C0010+HB1879
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11C0066+HB1879
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1378+HB1879
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09C0047+HB1879
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09V0006+HB1879
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0048HB1879+HB1879
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0054HB1879+HB1879

Bill Comments 750

feedback