VA HB1879 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1879
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption. Allows distillers that have been appointed as agents of the Board of Directors (the Board) of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority), mixed beverage restaurant licensees, and limited mixed beverage restaurant licensees to sell mixed beverages for off-premises consumption and deliver such mixed beverages to consumers subject to requirements set forth in the bill. The bill allows the Board to summarily revoke a licensee's privileges to sell and deliver mixed beverages for off-premises consumption for noncompliance with the requirements set forth in the bill or applicable provisions of current law. The bill also allows farm winery licensees to sell pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption. The bill directs the Authority to convene a work group to study the sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption and report its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by November 1, 2021. The provisions of the bill sunset on July 1, 2022.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102643D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1879 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |