VA HB1879 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management facilities; private residential lots; disclosure. Directs the State Water Control Board to adopt regulations requiring any local stormwater management authority that requires a residential landowner to maintain a stormwater management facility on his property to record with the deed for the property a statement of the specifications and requirements and a schedule of audits of the facility. The bill requires the seller of any property with such a facility to disclose the specifications, requirements, and schedule of audits to a purchaser of the property.
Title
Stormwater management facilities; private residential lots, disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101519D |