VA HB1877 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1877
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Legal service plans; seller registration. Provides that a legal services plans seller may offer, advertise, or execute, or cause to be executed by the subscriber, any subscription contract in the Commonwealth if the seller has submitted the seller's information and fees to the legal services organization for which the seller offers subscription contracts. The bill requires the legal services organization to submit the information and fees to the Commissioner of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services within 30 days or receiving such information and fees. Legal service plans; seller registration. Provides that a legal services plans seller may offer, advertise, or execute, or cause to be executed by the subscriber, any subscription contract in the Commonwealth if the seller has submitted the seller's information and fees to the legal services organization for which the seller offers subscription contracts. The bill requires the legal services organization to submit the information and fees to the Commissioner of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services within 30 days or receiving such information and fees.
Title
Legal service plans; seller registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1877H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21102975D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 21102975D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101132D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1877 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)