VA HB1874 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cruelty to animals; serious bodily injury; penalty. Provides that any person who tortures, willfully inflicts inhumane injury or pain not connected with bona fide scientific or medical experimentation, or cruelly and unnecessarily beats, maims, or mutilates any dog or cat that is a companion animal whether belonging to him or another and as a direct result causes serious bodily injury to such dog or cat is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Current law requires that the animal die for the person to be guilty of the felony. This bill is identical to SB 1604.
Title
Cruelty to animals; increases penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 536 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1874ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference substitute printed 19107614D-H2 |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: DeSteph, Spruill, Chafin |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Ransone, Bell, Robert B., Mullin |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 19107369D-S2 (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1874S2 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19107369D-S2 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 19107355D-S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107369D-S2 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107355D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reconsidered by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1874H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106243D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106243D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102784D |