VA HB1872 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Protective helmets on motorcycles and autocycles; organ donor exemption. Exempts any operator of and passenger on a motorcycle or autocycle who is 21 years of age or older and a registered organ donor from the requirement to wear a protective helmet when on a motorcycle or autocycle. The bill reduces operating or riding on a motorcycle or autocycle without a protective helmet from a primary offense to a secondary offense, which can be charged only when the offender is stopped for another, separate offense.
Title
Motorcycles and autocycles; protective helmets, organ donor exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 8-N) (Y: 2 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 8-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100466D |