VA HB1868 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1868

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Commercial driver's licenses. Disqualifies for life from holding a commercial driver's license persons convicted of a felony involving an act or practice of severe forms of trafficking in persons while driving a commercial motor vehicle. The bill prohibits the Department of Motor Vehicles and every district court or circuit court or the clerk thereof from reducing, dismissing, deferring, or otherwise concealing a conviction of any offense committed while operating a commercial motor vehicle or of any holder of a commercial driver's license or permit charged with any offense committed while operating a noncommercial motor vehicle and requires the Department and the courts to comply with federal laws and regulations regarding such convictions. The bill also authorizes Class A driver training schools to administer the commercial driver's license knowledge examinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial driver's licenses; disqualification for life from holding license, human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0136)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 136 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201
2021-02-27SenateSigned by President
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1868ER)
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled
2021-02-23SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23SenateRead third time
2021-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102058D

Same As/Similar To

HB1868 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621702(n/a)See Bill Text
462341.18(n/a)See Bill Text
462382(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1868
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1868+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1868ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0136+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1868F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1868FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1902C0005+HB1868
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H19C0013+HB1868
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1119+HB1868
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11C0028+HB1868
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11V0024+HB1868
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0299HB1868+HB1868
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0350HB1868+HB1868

Bill Comments 750

feedback