VA HB1868 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1868
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial driver's licenses. Disqualifies for life from holding a commercial driver's license persons convicted of a felony involving an act or practice of severe forms of trafficking in persons while driving a commercial motor vehicle. The bill prohibits the Department of Motor Vehicles and every district court or circuit court or the clerk thereof from reducing, dismissing, deferring, or otherwise concealing a conviction of any offense committed while operating a commercial motor vehicle or of any holder of a commercial driver's license or permit charged with any offense committed while operating a noncommercial motor vehicle and requires the Department and the courts to comply with federal laws and regulations regarding such convictions. The bill also authorizes Class A driver training schools to administer the commercial driver's license knowledge examinations.
Title
Commercial driver's licenses; disqualification for life from holding license, human trafficking.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Joseph McNamara [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102058D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1868 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 382 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |