VA HB1866 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1866
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Court-appointed special advocates; information sharing. Permits court-appointed special advocates to participate in and verbally share information with family partnership meetings and in meetings of family assessment and planning teams, multidisciplinary child sexual abuse response teams, individualized education program teams, and multidisciplinary teams related to child abuse. Court-appointed special advocates; information sharing. Permits court-appointed special advocates to participate in and verbally share information with family partnership meetings and in meetings of family assessment and planning teams, multidisciplinary child sexual abuse response teams, individualized education program teams, and multidisciplinary teams related to child abuse.
Title
Court-appointed special advocates; information sharing.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1866H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103025D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103025D-H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101961D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1866 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)