VA HB1865 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Certain students in kindergarten through grade 3; reading intervention services. Requires reading intervention services for students in kindergarten through grade three who demonstrate deficiencies based on their individual performance on the Standards of Learning reading test or any reading diagnostic test that meets criteria established by the Department of Education to be evidence-based, including services that are grounded in the science of reading, and include explicit, systematic, sequential, and cumulative instruction, to include phonemic awareness, systematic phonics, fluency, vocabulary development, and text comprehension as appropriate based on the student's demonstrated reading deficiencies. The bill requires the parent of each student who receives such reading intervention services to be notified before the services begin and the progress of each such student to be monitored throughout the provision of services. Certain students in kindergarten through grade 3; reading intervention services. Requires reading intervention services for students in kindergarten through grade three who demonstrate deficiencies based on their individual performance on the Standards of Learning reading test or any reading diagnostic test that meets criteria established by the Department of Education to be evidence-based, including services that are grounded in the science of reading, and include explicit, systematic, sequential, and cumulative instruction, to include phonemic awareness, systematic phonics, fluency, vocabulary development, and text comprehension as appropriate based on the student's demonstrated reading deficiencies. The bill requires the parent of each student who receives such reading intervention services to be notified before the services begin and the progress of each such student to be monitored throughout the provision of services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kindergarten through grade 3; reading intervention services for certain students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HousePrinted as engrossed 21101101D-E
2021-01-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1865E
2021-01-22HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-22HouseRead second time
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N)
2021-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101101D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1865
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1865+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1865E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1865AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103068A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1865F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1865FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0903V0003+HB1865
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H09V0027+HB1865
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1044+HB1865
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0142+HB1865

Bill Comments

feedback