VA HB1864 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Vaccine requirements for state agency employees; exemption. Creates an exemption to vaccine requirements implemented by state agencies for any state agency employees who are philosophically opposed to receiving such vaccination.
Title
State agency employees; vaccine requirements, creates exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101528D |