VA HB1864 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1864

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Human Rights Act; definition of employer; person employing one or more domestic workers. Expands the definition of "employer" for all purposes of the Virginia Human Rights Act to include a person employing one or more domestic workers, as defined in the bill. Virginia Human Rights Act; definition of employer; person employing one or more domestic workers. Expands the definition of "employer" for all purposes of the Virginia Human Rights Act to include a person employing one or more domestic workers, as defined in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Human Rights Act; expands definition of employer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 506 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201
2021-02-27SenateSigned by President
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1864ER)
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled
2021-02-24HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N)
2021-02-24HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 21200548D-S1 (54-Y 44-N)
2021-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-23SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N)
2021-02-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1864S1
2021-02-23SenateSubstitute by Senator McClellan agreed to 21200548D-S1
2021-02-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-23SenateRead third time
2021-02-23SenateFloor substitute printed 21200548D-S1 (McClellan)
2021-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19SenateReported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
2021-02-17SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2021-02-17SenateRereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N)
2021-02-17SenateReconsidered by General Laws and Technology
2021-02-10SenateFailed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (7-Y 7-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-27HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseReported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-13HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101526D

Same As/Similar To

HB1864 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223905(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1864
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1864+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1864S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1864ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0506+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200548D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1864F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1864FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1864FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1101C0003+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11C0061+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1256+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0117+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0036+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0044+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0081+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0299HB1864+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0374HB1864+HB1864
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1933+HB1864

Bill Comments

feedback