VA HB1864 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1864
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; definition of employer; person employing one or more domestic workers. Expands the definition of "employer" for all purposes of the Virginia Human Rights Act to include a person employing one or more domestic workers, as defined in the bill.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; expands definition of employer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101526D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1864 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)