VA HB1864 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by President as reenrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by President as reenrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
School-based offenses; delinquency charges. Clarifies that a local law-enforcement agency is not required to file delinquency charges against a student and that a school and a local law-enforcement agency may deal with school-based offenses through graduated sanctions or educational programming after a school principal reports to a local law-enforcement agency certain acts by such student that may constitute a criminal offense. The bill also requires the Board of Education and the Department of Criminal Justice Services to develop a model cooperative agreement between schools and local law-enforcement agencies for dealing with school-based offenses.
Title
School principals; incident reports.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Del. Roxann Robinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #2 and #4 (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1864ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #2 and #4 (38-Y 2-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 2 and 4 (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 1 and 3 (1-Y 95-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1864ER) |
2013-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1864H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104429D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104429D-H1 |
2013-01-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Students and Early Education |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101520D |