VA HB1862 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1862
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Employee protections; medicinal use of cannabis oil. Prohibits an employer from discharging, disciplining, or discriminating against an employee for such employee's lawful use of cannabis oil pursuant to a valid written certification issued by a practitioner for the treatment or to eliminate the symptoms of the employee's diagnosed condition or disease. The bill provides that such prohibition does not (i) restrict an employer's ability to take any adverse employment action for any work impairment caused by the use of cannabis oil or to prohibit possession during work hours or (ii) require an employer to commit any act that would cause the employer to be in violation of federal law or that would result in the loss of a federal contract or federal funding. Employee protections; medicinal use of cannabis oil. Prohibits an employer from discharging, disciplining, or discriminating against an employee for such employee's lawful use of cannabis oil pursuant to a valid written certification issued by a practitioner for the treatment or to eliminate the symptoms of the employee's diagnosed condition or disease. The bill provides that such prohibition does not (i) restrict an employer's ability to take any adverse employment action for any work impairment caused by the use of cannabis oil or to prohibit possession during work hours or (ii) require an employer to commit any act that would cause the employer to be in violation of federal law or that would result in the loss of a federal contract or federal funding.
Title
Employee protections; medicinal use of cannabis oil.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2021-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101426D-E |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1862E |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101426D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1862 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)