VA HB1861 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Expungement of police and court records; misdemeanor and nonviolent felony convictions. Allows a person convicted of a misdemeanor or nonviolent felony to file a petition requesting expungement of the police and court records relating to the conviction if such person has (i) been free from any term of incarceration, probation, and postrelease supervision imposed as a result of such conviction for at least eight years, (ii) no prior or subsequent convictions other than traffic infractions, and (iii) no pending criminal proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police & court records; expungement of records relating to misdemeanor/nonviolent felony conviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102019D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192392.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback