VA HB1859 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rabies clinics. Requires a local governing body to ensure that a rabies clinic is conducted to serve the jurisdiction at least once every two years. Currently, a clinic is to be held once a year if the local government finds that the number of resident veterinarians is inadequate to meet the need for rabies vaccination.
Title
Rabies; local governing body to hold clinic at least once every two years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 286 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1859ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 13100021D-E |
2013-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1859E |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100021D |