VA HB1856 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Restitution; probation. Provides that for any offense that occurs on or after July 1, 2017, if restitution is ordered at the time of sentencing, the court shall place the defendant on an indefinite term of probation until all ordered restitution is paid in full. The bill requires that a probation agency ordered to monitor the restitution payments of a defendant placed on supervised probation notify the court and the attorney for the Commonwealth of the amount of unsatisfied restitution, if any, 30 days prior to the defendant's release from supervision. The bill also requires that a court schedule a hearing if any restitution remains unsatisfied on the date upon which restitution was to be paid in full within 90 days of such date if no probation agency was ordered to monitor the defendant's payments. The bill also establishes a mechanism for releasing a defendant from an indefinite term of probation even though all ordered restitution has not been paid in full. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to SB 1285.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restitution; supervised probation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (18-Y 79-N) (Y: 18 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05HouseCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (18-Y 79-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 79-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's substitute printed 17106008D-H2
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1856ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 15-N 1-A)
2017-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 17105499D-S2 (80-Y 15-N 1-A)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1856S2
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenatePassed by for the day
2017-02-17SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105499D-S2
2017-02-17SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-17SenateCommittee substitute rejected 17105351D-S1
2017-02-17SenateRead third time
2017-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105499D-S2
2017-02-15SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105351D-S1
2017-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N)
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1856H1
2017-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104750D-H1
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-04HouseRead first time
2017-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104750D-H1
2017-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2017-01-13HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103210D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192303(n/a)See Bill Text
192304(n/a)See Bill Text
192305(n/a)See Bill Text
192305.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192306(n/a)See Bill Text
192368.15(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1856
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1856+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1856H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1856S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1856S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1856ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1856H2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0063+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0066+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0089+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0208V0007+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H02V0058+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2100+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0263+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0294+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0627HB1856+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0694HB1856+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0695HB1856+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0696HB1856+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2596+HB1856
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2880+HB1856

Bill Comments

feedback