VA HB1853 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Planning and zoning; effects of development on military installations. Requires any local planning commission to consult with the commander of a military installation that will be affected by development within the locality in order to reasonably protect the installation against potential adverse effects of development.
Title
Planning, zoning, etc., procedures; local commission shall consult with installation commander.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 213 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1853ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1853H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104784D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104784D-H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101334D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1029 (Same As) 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |