VA HB1852 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying concealed handguns; protective orders. Authorizes any person 21 years of age or older who is not prohibited from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm and is protected by an unexpired protective order to carry a concealed handgun for 45 days after the protective order was issued. The bill provides that if the person issued the protective order applies for a concealed handgun permit during such 45-day period, such person will be authorized to carry a concealed handgun for an additional 45 days and be given a copy of the certified application, which shall serve as a de facto concealed handgun permit. The bill requires such person to have the order or certified application and photo identification on his person when carrying a concealed handgun and to display them upon demand by a law-enforcement officer; failure to do so is punishable by a $25 civil penalty. This bill is identical to SB 1299.
Title
Concealed handguns; protective orders.
Sponsors
Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Del. Rick Morris [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Del. Michael Webert [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 31-N) (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) (Y: 3 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (64-Y 31-N) (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 32-N) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 31-N) (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) (Y: 3 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (64-Y 31-N) (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 32-N) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | (67 affirmative votes required to override) |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (65-Y 34-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (65-Y 34-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1852ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 31-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (63-Y 31-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Vogel, Petersen, Chafin |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Delegates: Gilbert, Wright, Heretick |
2017-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-20 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105305D-S1 (3-Y 95-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1852S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105305D-S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105305D-S1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (64-Y 31-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Passed House (64-Y 31-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 32-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 32-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102313D-E |
2017-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1852E |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-24 | House | Passed by until Tuesday, January 31, 2017 |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (12-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102313D |
Subjects
Concealed Weapons
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Firearms
Handguns
Protective Orders
Weapons
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Firearms
Handguns
Protective Orders
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.01:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |