VA HB1852 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Number of general district court judges; 21st Judicial District; Martinsville, and Henry and Patrick Counties. Increases the maximum number of general district court judges in the 21st Judicial District (Martinsville, and Henry and Patrick Counties) from one to two.
Title
General district court judges; increases number in 21st Judicial District.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101487D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1852 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1852+hil |