VA HB1852 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Inspection of food establishments and labeling of foods. Exempts private homes where the resident processes and prepares certain food products, including dried fruits, dry herbs, dry seasonings, nuts, vinegars, dried pasta, dry baking mixes, and cereals, from inspection by the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services (VDACS), so long as the resident processing and preparing the product affixes a label to the product that indicates the name, address, and the telephone number of the person preparing the food product and that the residence has not been inspected by VDACS.
Title
Home-processed food; inspection of food establishments, labeling of foods with name of preparer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 285 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1852ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 13104248D-EH1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1852EH1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Amendment by Delegate Orrock agreed to |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104248D-H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104248D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100423D |