VA HB1851 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Aircraft registration; unmanned aircraft. Exempts an owner of an unmanned aircraft from the requirement to register aircrafts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unmanned aircraft; exempts an owner from the requirement to register.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 15-N) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (84-Y 15-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (84-Y 15-N)
2021-01-21HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-20HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-19HouseRead first time
2021-01-18HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100608D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback