VA HB1851 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Assault and battery against a family or household member; deferred disposition; waiver of appeal. Provides that a person charged with a first offense of assault against a family or household member who consents to probation and a deferred disposition of the charge has no right of appeal if he is subsequently found guilty of the original charge for a violation of the terms of his probation. The bill provides that a person may file a motion to withdraw his consent within 10 days of entry of the order deferring proceedings and the court shall schedule a hearing within 30 days of receipt of the motion. The bill provides further that if the person appears at the hearing and requests to withdraw his consent, the court shall grant the request, enter a final order adjudicating guilt, and sentence the person accordingly. If the person fails to appear at the hearing, the court shall deny the motion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault and battery against a family or household member; deferred disposition, waiver of appeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 785 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1851ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1851ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24SenatePassed by temporarily
2017-02-24 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Obenshain, Stuart, Howell
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Bell, Robert B., Bagby
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2017-02-22SenateSenate requested conference committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 17105454D-S1 (0-Y 95-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1851S1
2017-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105454D-S1
2017-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateRecommitted to Courts of Justice
2017-02-16SenateMotion to recommit to committee agreed to
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2017-02-15SenateRead third time
2017-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105454D-S1
2017-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 17102595D-E
2017-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1851E
2017-02-01HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-01HouseRead second time
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
2017-01-13HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102595D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18257.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1851
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1851+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1851E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1851S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1851ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1851ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0785+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0061+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0077+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1859+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0272+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0527HB1851+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0313+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0694HB1851+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0695HB1851+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0696HB1851+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2594+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0814HB1851+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1048HB1851+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2781+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2877+HB1851
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1164HB1851+HB1851

Bill Comments

feedback