VA HB1845 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-8)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; license fee reform; delay; emergency. Delays the effective date of the 2020 alcoholic beverage control license and fee reform from July 1, 2021, to January 1, 2022. During the period of delay and subject to certain requirements, the bill allows on-premises wine or beer licensees to sell wine or beer for off-premises consumption and allows such licensees, as well as off-premises wine or beer licensees, to deliver wine or beer that the licensee is authorized to sell without a delivery permit. The bill contains a technical amendment and an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; license fee reform.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House
2021-01-18HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2021-01-18HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21100640D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41230(n/a)See Bill Text
41233.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback