VA HB1845 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Harassment by computer; impersonating another; penalty. Provides that a person who uses a computer to communicate obscene, vulgar, profane, lewd, lascivious, or indecent language, make an obscene proposal, or threaten an illegal or immoral act with the intent to defraud any person is guilty of harassment by computer, a Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, in order to be guilty of harassment by computer, a person must have the intent to coerce, intimidate, or harass any person. The bill also provides that it is a Class 6 felony to commit harassment by computer if the person has assumed the identity of another living individual. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Harassment by computer; impersonating another; penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102607D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1845 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1845+hil |