VA HB1843 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1843
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable gaming; increase in certain maximum allowable prize amounts. Increases the maximum allowable amount for a single bingo door prize from $50 to $250 and the maximum allowable cumulative door prizes in any one bingo session from $250 to $500. The bill allows up to 10 games per bingo session to feature a regular bingo or special bingo game prize of up to $200. The bill increases the prize for a single instant bingo, pull tab, or seal card from $1,000 to $2,000. Finally, the bill increases from $100 to $200 the allowable amount of increase of a progressive prize per session in certain progressive bingo games. The bill requires the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, beginning July 1, 2024, and at least once every five years thereafter, to convene a stakeholder work group to review the limitations on prize amounts and provide any recommendations to the General Assembly by November 30 of the year in which the stakeholder work group is convened. Charitable gaming; increase in certain maximum allowable prize amounts. Increases the maximum allowable amount for a single bingo door prize from $50 to $250 and the maximum allowable cumulative door prizes in any one bingo session from $250 to $500. The bill allows up to 10 games per bingo session to feature a regular bingo or special bingo game prize of up to $200. The bill increases the prize for a single instant bingo, pull tab, or seal card from $1,000 to $2,000. Finally, the bill increases from $100 to $200 the allowable amount of increase of a progressive prize per session in certain progressive bingo games. The bill requires the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, beginning July 1, 2024, and at least once every five years thereafter, to convene a stakeholder work group to review the limitations on prize amounts and provide any recommendations to the General Assembly by November 30 of the year in which the stakeholder work group is convened.
Title
Charitable gaming; increase in certain maximum allowable prize amounts.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1843ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1843H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103827D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103827D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101443D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1843 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)