VA HB1842 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Property Owners' Association Act; Condominium Act; rulemaking authority of property owners' associations and unit owners' associations; smoking. Permits (i) except to the extent that the declaration provides otherwise, the board of directors of a property owners' association to establish reasonable rules that restrict smoking in the development, including (a) rules that prohibit smoking in the common areas and, (b) for developments that include attached private dwelling units, rules that prohibit smoking within such dwelling units, and (ii) except to the extent that the condominium instruments provide otherwise, the executive board of a condominium unit owners' association to establish reasonable rules that restrict smoking in the condominium, including rules that prohibit smoking in the common elements and within units. The bill clarifies the authority of executive boards of condominium unit owners' associations to establish, adopt, and enforce rules and regulations with respect to the use of the common elements of the condominium and with respect to such other areas of responsibility assigned to the unit owners' association by the condominium instruments, except where expressly reserved by the condominium instruments to the unit owners. The bill also permits unit owners, by a majority of votes cast at a meeting of the unit owners' association, to repeal or amend any rule or regulation adopted by the executive board. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission. Property Owners' Association Act; Condominium Act; rulemaking authority of property owners' associations and unit owners' associations; smoking. Permits (i) except to the extent that the declaration provides otherwise, the board of directors of a property owners' association to establish reasonable rules that restrict smoking in the development, including (a) rules that prohibit smoking in the common areas and, (b) for developments that include attached private dwelling units, rules that prohibit smoking within such dwelling units, and (ii) except to the extent that the condominium instruments provide otherwise, the executive board of a condominium unit owners' association to establish reasonable rules that restrict smoking in the condominium, including rules that prohibit smoking in the common elements and within units. The bill clarifies the authority of executive boards of condominium unit owners' associations to establish, adopt, and enforce rules and regulations with respect to the use of the common elements of the condominium and with respect to such other areas of responsibility assigned to the unit owners' association by the condominium instruments, except where expressly reserved by the condominium instruments to the unit owners. The bill also permits unit owners, by a majority of votes cast at a meeting of the unit owners' association, to repeal or amend any rule or regulation adopted by the executive board. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property owners' associations & unit owners' associations; rulemaking authority concerning smoking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N)
2021-01-18HousePrinted as engrossed 21102397D-E
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1842E
2021-01-18HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-18HouseRead second time
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2021-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102397D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511819(n/a)See Bill Text
5511819.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5511959(n/a)See Bill Text
5511960.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1842
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1842+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1842E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1842AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/forconsiderationsubs.aspx?ld=21102965&bil=HB1842&ses=211
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103060A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1842F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1842FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1102V0006+HB1842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11V0022+HB1842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV0966+HB1842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0112+HB1842

Bill Comments

feedback