VA HB1840 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; pilot programs for transmission facilities serving business parks. Directs the Virginia Economic Development Partnership to establish pilot programs by Dominion Energy Virginia and Appalachian Power. The pilot programs will have the purpose of promoting economic development in opportunity zones of the Commonwealth by allowing each utility to complete the construction phase of electric transmission infrastructure for up to three business parks prior to the public announcement of a prospective occupant of the business parks. Electric cooperatives may also petition the State Corporation Commission to participate in the pilot program. The measure authorizes a utility to recover the costs of the transmission facility through a rate adjustment clause. The provisions of this measure expire on December 31, 2023.
Title
Business parks; pilot program to facilitate construction of electric transmission facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 535 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1840ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 18-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (82-Y 18-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (74-Y 23-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1840H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105532D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105532D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102780D |