VA HB1839 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School principals; incident reports. Provides that school principals are not required to report criminal misdemeanors or status offenses to law enforcement if in the principal's discretion, based on a totality of the circumstances and consistent with Board of Education guidelines, such report is not warranted. The bill requires the Board of Education, in consultation with the Department of Juvenile Justice, the Office of the Attorney General, and any interested stakeholders, to update its Student Conduct Policy Guidelines to provide guidance for principals in exercising such discretion.
Title
School principals; incident reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102485D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1839 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1839+hil |