VA HB1837 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; membership. Clarifies that each of the six nonlegislative citizen members of the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board (the Board) who is not an at-large member is to be appointed by the Governor from a list of two qualified nominees submitted for each vacancy by the Board and the Board of Directors of the Virginia Association of Soil and Water Conservation Districts (the Association) in consultation with other groups. The bill also requires each of the six nonlegislative citizen members to be a resident of a different one of the six geographic areas represented in the Association. The bill contains technical amendments. Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; membership. Clarifies that each of the six nonlegislative citizen members of the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board (the Board) who is not an at-large member is to be appointed by the Governor from a list of two qualified nominees submitted for each vacancy by the Board and the Board of Directors of the Virginia Association of Soil and Water Conservation Districts (the Association) in consultation with other groups. The bill also requires each of the six nonlegislative citizen members to be a resident of a different one of the six geographic areas represented in the Association. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; clarifies membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1837H1
2021-01-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103143D-H1
2021-01-22HouseRead second time
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103143D-H1
2021-01-20HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100998D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101502(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1837
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1837+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1837H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103143D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103143.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1837F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1837FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0102V0001+HB1837
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H01V0031+HB1837
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1022+HB1837
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S01V0063+HB1837

Bill Comments

feedback