VA HB1836 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Secretary of Natural Resources. Renames the Secretary of Natural Resources as the Secretary of Natural and Cultural Resources. The bill also designates the Secretary as the Chief Resilience Officer and removes the Virginia Museum of Natural History from the purview of the Secretary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources, Secretary of; changes name to the Secretary of Natural and Cultural Resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N)
2021-01-18HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-13HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (17-Y 5-N)
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101981D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011018(n/a)See Bill Text
1011181.15(n/a)See Bill Text
1011188(n/a)See Bill Text
1011329(n/a)See Bill Text
1011402.03(n/a)See Bill Text
1011402.04(n/a)See Bill Text
1011405(n/a)See Bill Text
1012129(n/a)See Bill Text
1012202.3(n/a)See Bill Text
101603.25(n/a)See Bill Text
101704(n/a)See Bill Text
1522295.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221156(n/a)See Bill Text
221176(n/a)See Bill Text
22200(n/a)See Bill Text
22205(n/a)See Bill Text
22206(n/a)See Bill Text
22215(n/a)See Bill Text
22220.1(n/a)See Bill Text
22220.2(n/a)See Bill Text
22220.3(n/a)See Bill Text
222316(n/a)See Bill Text
222338(n/a)See Bill Text
222481(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.10(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.11(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.13(n/a)See Bill Text
282207(n/a)See Bill Text
291102(n/a)See Bill Text
291573(n/a)See Bill Text
291579(n/a)See Bill Text
581344.3(n/a)See Bill Text
621195.1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.117(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.118(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.119:1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:68(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.34:25(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.34:28(n/a)See Bill Text
62169.31(n/a)See Bill Text
62169.32(n/a)See Bill Text
62169.33(n/a)See Bill Text
62169.41(n/a)See Bill Text
62169.52(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback