VA HB1836 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Department of Transportation to maintain a certain segment of Spotsylvania Parkway beginning in 2020. Requires the Virginia Department of Transportation, as of July 1, 2020, to take over maintenance of an approximately two-mile segment of Spotsylvania Parkway that is currently maintained pursuant to a 2005 "Easement and Cost Sharing Agreement" unless the homeowners association that is party to such cost-sharing agreement and Spotsylvania County reach a new road maintenance agreement prior to July 1, 2020.
Title
Spotsylvania Parkway; VDOT to maintain a certain segment beginning in 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1836ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103242D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1836E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103242D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Spotsylvania County
Transportation
Uncodified Legislation
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Spotsylvania County
Transportation
Uncodified Legislation