VA HB1835 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; rate reductions. Eliminates provisions that limit any rate reduction ordered by the State Corporation Commission in the first triennial review of Dominion Energy Virginia after January 1, 2021, to $50 million in annual revenues and provides that in any triennial review, regardless of whether the Commission has ordered bill credits, the utility earned above its authorized rate of return during the test period under review, or the utility has made a request regarding any customer credit reinvestment offsets, the Commission may order any rate reduction it deems necessary and appropriate unless it finds that the resulting rates will not provide the utility with the opportunity to (i) fully recover its costs of providing its services and (ii) earn not less than a fair combined rate of return on its generation and distribution services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; rate reductions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseIncorporated by Labor and Commerce
2021-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1914-Helmer) by voice vote
2021-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101289D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback