VA HB1835 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Notices from DMV; fee for exchange of license plates. Establishes certain practices relating to government efficiency, including allowing driver's license expiration notices, etc., to be sent by first-class mail or email and eliminating requirements to send notices of suspension or revocation and mandatory license clinic attendance by certified mail. The bill also imposes a $5 service charge on transactions performed at DMV Customer Service Centers if such transactions could have been completed by telephone, by mail, or electronically. The bill also creates a procedure and fee options for an exchange of license plates and imposes a minimum fee for the exchange. This bill is the same as
Title
Service of notices from DMV; fee for renewal of driver's license, exchange of license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 29-N) (Y: 57 N: 31 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057) | |
2011-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 57 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1835ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 29-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105204D-S1 (57-Y 29-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1835S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105204D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105204D-S1 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103366D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 214.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 332 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 692.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |