VA HB1834 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Use of binary explosives; penalty. Creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to combine the components of a binary explosive, defined in the bill, to create an explosive material and ignite more than five pounds of such explosive material at a single time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Binary explosives; use, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-11HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-02HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100493D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18285(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback