VA HB1834 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Distracted driving; penalty. Expands the prohibition on manually entering multiple letters or text in a handheld communications device while operating a motor vehicle to also prohibit the manual selection of multiple icons and removes the condition that such manual entry is prohibited only if performed as a means of communicating with another person. The bill prohibits the operator of a motor vehicle from reading any information displayed on the device; current law prohibits reading an email or text message. The bill provides that this prohibition does not apply to reading any information displayed through the use of a global positioning system for the purposes of navigation. The bill eliminates the current exemption from the prohibition on using a handheld personal communications device while operating a motor vehicle when the vehicle is stopped or not moving; the current exemption from the prohibition when the vehicle is parked is not affected.
Title
Distracted driving; penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. James Edmunds [R] | Del. Chris Jones [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 10-N) (Y: 9 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 10-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103620D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1078.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 868 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 869.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |