VA HB1834 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; permissible fireworks. Redefines what constitutes permissible fireworks in Virginia, and prevents localities from prohibiting the use, design, possession, ignition, display, storage, sale, or transportation of permissible fireworks, or the setup or supervision thereof. Further, the bill provides that the storage and sale of permissible fireworks shall be governed by the Code for the Manufacture, Transportation, Storage, and Retail Sale of Fireworks and Pyrotechnic Articles adopted by the National Fire Protection Association (NFPA 1124, 2006 Edition), and to the extent that NFPA Standard 1124 doesn't apply to buildings or structures, a locality may enforce any mercantile occupancy requirements. The bill provides that it does not limit any local zoning authority lawfully exercised.
Title
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; permissible fireworks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 40-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (57-Y 40-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1834H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105068D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105068D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103636D |