VA HB1833 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1833
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Conservation and Recreation; leasing of land. Changes the process by which the Department of Conservation and Recreation may lease certain lands from one that is subject to the consent and approval of the Governor and the General Assembly to one that is subject to the written recommendation of the Department of General Services to the Governor and the written approval of the Governor, and excludes the sale of such land from such process. The bill also authorizes only certain activities for which the Department may lease land and requires that information about leasing activities be included in an annual report to the General Assembly. Department of Conservation and Recreation; leasing of land. Changes the process by which the Department of Conservation and Recreation may lease certain lands from one that is subject to the consent and approval of the Governor and the General Assembly to one that is subject to the written recommendation of the Department of General Services to the Governor and the written approval of the Governor, and excludes the sale of such land from such process. The bill also authorizes only certain activities for which the Department may lease land and requires that information about leasing activities be included in an annual report to the General Assembly.
Title
Conservation and Recreation, Department of; leasing of land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102063D-E |
2021-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1833E |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102063D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1833 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)