VA HB1833 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System; conservation officers. Adds conservation officers of the Department of Conservation and Recreation as members of the Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System. Conservation officers would accrue retirement benefits under the Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System only for creditable service earned on or after July 1, 2017.
Title
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System; conservation officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102782D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1833 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1833+hil |